California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2791 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022