Assembly | 04/26/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |