|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4907.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|