|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 934, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5090.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|