Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.M. and J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|