Senate | 05/25/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 4708.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |