Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |