|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|