|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 974, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 4956.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5036.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|