Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |