|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1802.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1401.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|