Senate | 06/16/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |