Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | (pending re-refer to Com. on B. & P.) | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3186.) | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2021 | Read first time. To print. |