|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 419, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4877.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4657.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|