|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5129.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4584.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|