California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022