California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021