Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2021 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Levine. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2021 | Read first time. To print. |