|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 2826.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2334.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 1430.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|