|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 2970.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2516.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 1355.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|