06/28/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 23, Statutes of 2021. | |||
06/28/2021 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/22/2021 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1544.). | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 961.) | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Read first time. To print. |