|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2702.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2115.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1627.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|