Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|