California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021