California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Amended

Bill June 15, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021