|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2630.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2236.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|