Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 10. Page 1718.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|