|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2878.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2359.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1280.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|