|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2132.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|