Senate | 08/11/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1714.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |