Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2021 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Lorena Gonzalez. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |