|
07/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1907.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|