|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 559, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 2706.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2297.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 1629.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 924.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|