|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2237.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|