Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1251.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|