California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB461 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill June 14, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021