|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1251.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|