Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 1630.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|