California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021