California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021