Senate | 07/08/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 929.) | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2021 | Read first time. To print. |