|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2218.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 23. Page 1358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|