Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|