California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill August 31, 2021
Bill May 27, 2021