Senate | 08/26/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1408.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2021 | Read first time. To print. |