|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 619, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2483.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1336.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|