Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |