Senate | 06/28/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1727.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2021 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2021 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2021 | Read first time. To print. |