California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 2, 2022
Bill March 17, 2021