|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2845.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2390.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|